CT HB06898 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage healthy eating habits by preventing public schools from displaying any advertising for foods or beverages that are not otherwise allowed to be sold on the campus of such school during regular school hours.
Title
An Act Concerning The Marketing Of Unhealthy Foods In Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 127 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 103 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |