CT HB07122 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow a mobile dental clinic to submit claims for Medicaid reimbursement for services not more than fifty miles from the fixed dental location associated with the clinic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Mobile Dental Clinics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 404 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 164 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-149
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 574
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-21HouseFile Number 91
2019-03-21HouseHouse Calendar Number 81
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-07HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback