CT HB07242 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection to commission police officers at independent institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Police Officers At Independent Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24HouseNo New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-04-24HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-24HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 487
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 314
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback