CT HB07243 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require any transportation network company to adopt a policy to address rider safety and security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Transportation Network Company Safety And Security Policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseNo Action
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 488
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 315
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback