CT HB07244 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Senate Calendar Number 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Senate Calendar Number 594
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a grandparent the right of visitation with a minor child upon demonstrating to the court that clear and convincing circumstances support the granting of such visitation.
Title
An Act Concerning A Grandparent's Right To Visitation With His Or Her Grandchild.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 329 (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Senate Calendar Number 594 |
2017-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-05 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-25 | House | File Number 702 |
2017-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 458 |
2017-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |