CT HJ00176 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Decisions Of The Claims Commissioner To Dismiss Certain Claims Against The State.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Decisions Of The Claims Commissioner To Dismiss Certain Claims Against The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | File Number 496 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 346 |
2024-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |