CT SB00011 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 506
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To eliminate the requirement for approval by the Secretary of the United States Department of the Interior regarding the operation of a casino gaming facility in East Windsor by the Mashantucket Pequot Tribe and the Mohegan Tribe of Indians of Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Authorization Of A Casino Gaming Facility In East Windsor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 506
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 257
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback