CT SB00078 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend eligibility for the job expansion tax credit to new jobs created in 2014.
Title
An Act Extending The Job Expansion Tax Credit Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 369 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 247 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |