CT SB00140 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Connecticut Marketing Authority to enter into leasing, permitting and licensing agreements concerning property under the authority's control.
Title
An Act Concerning The Duties Of The Connecticut Marketing Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 234 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 238 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 234 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 238 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-161 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 516 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Commerce |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-22 | Senate | File Number 126 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 139 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |