CT SB00164 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide Medicaid coverage for home telemonitoring services by a home health care agency.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Coverage Of Telemonitoring Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Aging |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2016-03-23 | Senate | File Number 161 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 154 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |