CT SB00183 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 310
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 310
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Motor Vehicles regarding the electronic issuance of registration and certificates of title, transporter's registration, dealers, repairers, motor vehicle recyclers, drivers' schools, altered, composite, grey-market and salvage vehicles, school buses and minor revisions to the motor vehicle statutes.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 310 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 199 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |