CT SB00232 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - File Number 46
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce methane emissions and certain charges to gas customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Allowable Percentage Of Leakage From Gas Pipelines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateFile Number 46
2019-03-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 47
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-01-30SenatePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-01-28SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-25SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback