CT SB00233 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit wreckers to display steady blue lights when stationary.
Title
An Act Authorizing Use Of Steady Blue Lights On Wreckers.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Sen. Paul Cicarella [R] | Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Rep. John Piscopo [R] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 206 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 152 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |