CT SB00234 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal statutes concerning obsolete subject matter.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Social Services Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Theresa Gerratana [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | House Human Services Committee | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] |
Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Sen. Andrea Stillman [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-29 | Public Act 12-119 | |
2012-05-09 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Calendar Number 499 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4405 | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-19 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2012-04-02 | File Number 200 | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Calendar Number 183 | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |