CT SB00234 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a community spouse of an institutionalized spouse to retain the maximum amount of resources allowable under federal law.
Title
An Act Permitting A Community Spouse Of An Institutionalized Spouse To Retain The Maximum Amount Of Allowable Assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |