CT SB00248 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make various revisions to statutes affecting title to real property.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Statutes Affecting Title To Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-194 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 547 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5242 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | File Number 432 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 290 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |