CT SB00283 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 394
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 394
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) redefine "aggregate family income" and "financial hardship due to circumstances beyond the homeowner's control" in connection with the emergency mortgage assistance program, (2) change procedures (A) regarding applying for emergency mortgage assistance payments, (B) regarding making emergency mortgage assistance payments, (C) for establishing emergency mortgage assistance repayment agreements, and (D) regarding the posting of certain notices on the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority's Internet web site, (3) provide that the authority may adopt procedures to establish an aggregate limit on the amount of emergency mortgage assistance payments that certain homeowners may receive, and (4) require developers for certain projects to hire an advocate for the residents affected by such projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Programs Administered By The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 81 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 394 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3904 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | File Number 161 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 126 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |