CT SB00286 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require early childhood care and education programs to pay its employees an annual salary that is in accordance with the proposed early childhood educator compensation schedule, to make any employee of an early childhood care and education program eligible for Care 4 Kids and to expand the early childhood incubator program.
Title
An Act Concerning Early Childhood Care And Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |