CT SB00292 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - File Number 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - File Number 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Commissioner of Children and Families to administer, within available appropriations, a program of outreach, shelter and transitional living services for homeless youth.
Title
An Act Concerning Homeless Youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | File Number 648 | |
2010-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-27 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 345 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 231 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-12 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-12 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |