CT SB00303 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 325
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 325
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make grammatical and technical revisions to the higher education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical Revisions To The Higher Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 325 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | File Number 186 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 143 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |