CT SB00336 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend provisions concerning costs relating to and the appointment and term of the Metropolitan District of Hartford County's Independent Consumer Advocate, and make technical changes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Metropolitan District Of Hartford County's Independent Consumer Advocate.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Kate Farrar [D] | Rep. James Sanchez [D] | Sen. Derek Slap [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | File Number 388 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 250 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |