CT SB00341 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 219
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 219
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Fallen Officer Fund to provide payments to the surviving family of a police officer killed in the line of duty.
Title
An Act Establishing A Fallen Officer Fund And Providing Health Insurance Coverage To Survivors Of A Police Officer Killed In The Line Of Duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 219 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 165 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |