CT SB00356 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Veterans Affairs to mail to certain veterans information concerning veterans' benefits and suicide prevention.
Title
An Act Concerning The Mailing Of Information Regarding Veterans' Benefits And Suicide Prevention To Certain Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |