CT SB00360 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 506
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 506
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the per page fee paid to official court reporters and court reporting monitors for transcripts.
Title
An Act Concerning The Transcript Fees Charged By Official Court Reporters And Court Reporting Monitors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | File Number 506 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 294 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |