CT SB00387 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exclude certain voluntary payments given by contributors to online political donation platforms from (1) the definition of "contribution", and (2) the provisions regarding illegal campaign finance practices.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Online Donation Platforms For Political Campaigns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 470 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 279 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |