CT SB00391 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to process all properly completed applications under the Care 4 Kids program within thirty days.
Title
An Act Concerning Child Care Subsidies Under The Care 4 Kids Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-12 | Public Act 10-61 | |
2010-05-03 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-30 | House Calendar Number 470 | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-29 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4268 | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 402 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Calendar Number 269 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |