CT SB00393 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent the state from recouping public assistance payments from the proceeds of a cause of action brought by or on behalf of a recipient whose death was caused by the state's negligence.
Title
An Act Concerning Repayment Of State Aid By A Recipient Whose Death Is Caused By The State's Negligence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-17 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-10 | File Number 337 | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Calendar Number 262 | |
2012-04-10 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |