CT SB00397 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 337
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 337
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to seek federal approval to expand Medicaid coverage to all students in schools with a high percentage of students from low-income households and to establish an interagency coalition to maximize Medicaid funding of school health services.
Title
An Act Expanding Medicaid Coverage Of School-based Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 337 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 219 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |