CT SB00402 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) include the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services in the Behavioral Health Partnership, (2) transfer primary responsibility for the setting of behavioral health provider service rates from the Departments of Children and Families, Social Services, and Mental Health and Addiction Services to the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council, (3) allow the Behavioral Health Partnership to expand coverage to include SAGA medical services recipients, Medicaid recipients and Charter Oak Health Plan members, and (4) enable the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council to review behavioral health services available under the Charter Oak Health Plan.
Title
An Act Concerning The Behavioral Health Partnership.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Colapietro [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. Jonathan Harris [D] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | House Public Health Committee | Rep. Elizabeth Ritter [D] | Rep. Peter Villano [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 274 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-19 | Public Act 10-119 | |
2010-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | House Calendar Number 495 | |
2010-05-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | |
2010-05-01 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4842 | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 304 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 219 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-08 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |