CT SB00438 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 508
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 508
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the criminal procedure laws of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Criminal Procedure Laws Of This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | File Number 508 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 296 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |