CT SB00454 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-22 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-22 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the classifications of work established for prequalification purposes be set forth in a general bid, or require documentation of secondary subcontracts be submitted with the bid, to require construction-managers-at-risk to list such classifications in their bid and to require agents of the contracting agency to maintain certain documentation and be responsible for certain contractor violations.
Title
An Act Increasing The Transparency Of General Bids For State Contracts.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Toni Walker [D] | Rep. John Hampton [D] | Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] |
Sen. Andres Ayala [D] | Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-14 | Senate | File Number 522 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 352 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |