CT SB00499 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage municipalities to enter into agreements to share wastewater treatment facilities when such agreements will result in a cost savings to the state and to such municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For Wastewater Treatment Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Rep. Linda Gentile [D] | House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Leonard Suzio [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Environment | |
2011-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 445 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 284 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-21 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2011-01-28 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |