CT SB00647 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To streamline the Liquor Control Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Streamlining The Liquor Control Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10232 (Y: 7 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 10243 (Y: 9 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-11SenatePublic Act 19-24
2019-06-05SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2019-06-01SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
2019-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-01SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 692
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 10243
2019-05-30SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10232
2019-05-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-23SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-23SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9541
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 592
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 287
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on General Law
2019-03-21SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-01-31SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00647&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00024-R00SB-00647-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R00GL-CV13-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R00GL-CV35-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R00GL-CV52-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00647-R00FIN-CV151-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00259-R00SB00647-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00258-R00SB00647-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00257-R00SB00647-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00263-R00SB00647-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback