CT SB00693 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow a person who has a valid order of protection to request that such person's landlord change the locks to the person's dwelling unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Additional Housing Protections For A Victim Of Family Violence Or Sexual Assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 134 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 576
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-10SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-10SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-10SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8481
2019-04-29SenateFile Number 833
2019-04-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 433
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing 04/01
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-15SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback