CT SB00709 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/23
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/23
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the maximum airport access fee for off-airport parking operators at Bradley International Airport from four per cent to five per cent of the gross revenues of such operators, for calendar quarters commencing on or after July 1, 2011, and to clarify that the sales tax exemption for valet parking provided at an airport is applicable only to valet parking provided by off-airport parking operators.
Title
An Act Increasing Access Fees For Off-airport Parking Operators At Bradley International Airport And Clarifying The Applicability Of The Sales Tax Exemption For Valet Parking At Airports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-15 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |