CT SB00807 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To promote water conservation and efficient use of the state's water infrastructure, to reorganize the regulation of water companies from the Department of Public Health to the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, to eliminate the requirement that a municipality providing water service file an annual report, and to address unpaid utility accounts at multi-family dwellings.
Title
An Act Concerning Water Infrastructure And Conservation, Municipal Reporting Requirements And Unpaid Utility Accounts At Multi-family Dwellings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 149 PASS AS AMENDED BY A (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5651 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 149 PASS AS AMENDED BY A (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5651 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Public Act 13-78 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 444 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5651 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | File Number 108 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 140 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |