CT SB00837 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to identify high growth, high demand jobs and analyze the implementation and creation of partnerships that provide apprenticeship opportunities for such jobs.
Title
An Act Concerning Apprenticeship Opportunities For High Growth, High Demand Jobs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | File Number 369 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 196 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |