CT SB00854 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To waive the payment of course enrollment fees and extension fees for veterans and members of the Connecticut National Guard enrolled at public institutions of higher education in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Tuition And Fee Waivers For Veterans And Members Of The Connecticut National Guard At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | File Number 159 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 121 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |