CT SB00861 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Insurance Commissioner to develop, health care professionals to use, and health carriers to use and accept, uniform prior authorization forms, and to require health carriers and managed care organizations to make available electronically to health care professionals clinical criteria used for utilization review.
Title
An Act Concerning The Modernization Of Certain Medical Forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-11 | Senate | File Number 33 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 94 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/13 10:00 AM |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |