CT SB00922 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow municipalities to permit residents to install temporary health care structures on their property.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Health Care Structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 381 (Y: 142 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Public Act 17-155 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 539 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | File Number 529 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 293 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |