CT SB00950 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - File Number 839
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - File Number 839
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require mortgage lenders who seek to foreclose on residential real property to provide notice to the defendant that identifies the individual who has authority to refinance the mortgage, and to permit the court to deny or delay entry of a mortgage lender's motion to foreclose or motion for a deficiency judgment when the court finds that the mortgage lender did not provide such notice or act reasonably.
Title
An Act Concerning The Duties Of A Mortgagee In A Foreclosure Action On Residential Real Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | File Number 839 | |
2011-05-24 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-24 | New File by Committee on Banks | |
2011-05-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-18 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/23/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-05-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | |
2011-05-02 | File Number 692 | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 429 | |
2011-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |