CT SB00978 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - File Number 305
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - File Number 305
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand group health insurance coverage for the treatment of autism spectrum disorders to certificate holders in this state.
Title
An Act Expanding Group Health Insurance Coverage For The Treatment Of Autism Spectrum Disorders To Certificate Holders In This State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | File Number 305 | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Calendar Number 209 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |