CT SB00994 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To designate funds for the operation of state parks and the other environmental conservation related functions of the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning The Conservation Functions Of The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 416 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 211 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |