CT SB01030 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require foreign and alien insurance companies doing business in the state to appoint an agent for receipt of service of legal process in any proceeding arising from or related to any transaction having a connection with this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Service Of Process On The Insurance Commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-27 | Senate | File Number 200 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 189 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |