CT SB01030 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To shorten the audit period for the transfer of hazardous waste establishments from three years to sixty days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Transfer Of Hazardous Waste Establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-18SenatePublic Act 19-75
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 681
2019-05-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9793
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 237
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 108
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback