CT SB01030 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Nursing Home and Assisted Living Oversight Working Group regarding long-term care facilities and make other revisions to the long-term care facility statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Nursing Homes And Dementia Special Care Units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 370 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-185 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 568 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9433 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 457 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 281 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |