CT SB01052 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - File Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - File Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that each area agency on aging has not less than two staff members dedicated to helping persons served by the agencies to navigate and obtain available services.
Title
An Act Concerning Area Agencies On Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | File Number 674 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 404 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/23 5:00 PM |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |