CT SB01053 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide Medicaid and Husky B coverage to immigrant children regardless of legal immigration status.
Title
An Act Expanding Medicaid And Husky B Coverage For Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 550 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 248 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |