CT SB01130 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - File Number 753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - File Number 753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To review the programs and services administered or provided by state agencies providing public health, mental health or developmental services.
Title
An Act Concerning Expenditures Of State Agencies Providing Public Health, Mental Health And Developmental Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | File Number 753 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 465 | |
2011-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-31 | Public Hearing 04/11 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |