CT SJ00025 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Robin L. Wilson Of New Haven To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Robin L. Wilson Of New Haven To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 21 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateIn Concurrence
2019-03-27SenateAdopted, House
2019-03-14SenateHouse Calendar Number 50
2019-03-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-13SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-03-13SenateAdopted, Senate
2019-02-27SenateSenate Calendar Number 27
2019-02-27SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-02-25SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-14SenateNomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback